THE TOM WATSON MEMORIAL TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide for relief of persons who are or have been employed by Genday Holdings Ltd or any of its subsidiary companies or by Thomas Allen Watson deceased and or Margaret Loveday Watson and the widows widowers and other dependents of such persons, and the relief of patients of Field Lane Surgery Kessingland, who are sick, convalescent, infirm or in need of financial assistance.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2023
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Suffolk
Llywodraethu
- 17 Medi 2024: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1106129 The Louise Hamilton Trust
- 12 Awst 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 17 Medi 2024: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £55 | £3.41k | £1.24k | £84 | £96 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 22 Ionawr 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 13 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 12 Hydref 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 30 Medi 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 JULY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY GENDAY HOLDINGS LIMITED, COMPANY NO.1085655, OR ANY OF ITS SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES OR BY THOMAS ALLEN WATSON DECEASED FORMERLY OF MERBREEZE, NORTH CLIFF, KESSINGLAND, LOWESTOFT, SUFFOLK, NR33 7NZ, AND/OR THE AFORESAID MARGARET LOVELADY WATSON, AND THE WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN SO EMPLOYED WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; AND 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHOA RE PATIENTS OF FIELD LANE SURGERY, KESSINGLAND, LOWESTOFT, SUFFOLK, NR33 7QA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Maes buddion
KESSINGLAND, LOWESTOFT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window