Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau PRIMARY CARE TRUST STAFF WELFARE FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 1053793-19
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 04/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 31 JULY 2008 as amended on 17 Sep 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS WITHIN THE SOUTH ESSEX AREA, BY PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT PERFORMANCE OF THEIR DUTIES BY THE STAFF OF THE ESSEX PARTNERSHIP UNIVERSITY NHS FOUNDATION TRUST
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
- 05 Mawrth 2003: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.