Dogfen lywodraethu THE NEWBURY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2004, OCTOBER 2005, 11 OCTOBER 2007 AND 9 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2014 as amended on 05 Feb 2021 as amended on 13 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE: I TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR OLDER PEOPLE, IN NEWBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY WHO ARE IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT. II THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Maes buddion
NEWBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.