Dogfen lywodraethu ASHFORD PLACE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/05/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/12/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19/12/2013 as amended on 25 Mar 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's objects (the “Objects") are the prevention and relief of poverty, homelessness and unemployment by the provision of advice, housing, practical assistance and by conducting of research into factors that contribute to them, the relief of those in need by reason of youth, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage by the provision of advice, accommodation and services, the advancement of health, well-being and social isolation by provision of advice and services and the promotion of beneficial activities for people in Cricklewood, the London Borough of Brent and throughout London.
Maes buddion
CRICKLEWOOD, THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BRENT AND THROUGHOUT LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.