Dogfen lywodraethu WARWICKSHIRE YOUNG CARERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUN 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 MAR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OR ALLEVIATION OF ALL KINDS OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, SICKNESS AND DISABLEMENT AMONG CARERS AND THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THEY ARE CARING. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONG CARERS AND THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
WARWICKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.