Dogfen lywodraethu THE KING'S SCHOOL WORCESTER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 4 JULY 2003 AND 3 JULY 2009. as amended on 30 Nov 2018 as amended on 19 Mar 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, INCLUDING PHYSICAL TRAINING, BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT, IN OR NEAR WORCESTER, OF DAY AND/OR BOARDING SCHOOLS FOR BOYS AND GIRLS WITH THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE CHORISTERS OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF WORCESTER AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
IN OR NEAR WORCESTER
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.