Dogfen lywodraethu PAY & EMPLOYMENT RIGHTS SERVICE (YORKSHIRE) LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9 OCTOBER 2000, 7 OCTOBER 2002 AND 6 OCTOBER 2010. INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME ON 23 OCTOBER 1989 AND 18 OCTOBER 2002.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR POVERTY CAUSED BY LOW PAY; (B) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, PARTICULARLY IN EMPLOYMENT; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (D) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
YORKSHIRE, NATIONAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.