BANGLADESHI EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL & SOCIAL FORUM IN NEWHAM
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
We run a supplementary school and a Mother Tongue School. We work with disadvantaged and socially excluded people particularly families, people who are unemployed from all sections of the community irrespective of their background, race, creed, religion, or age or disability. We also deliver all other charitable activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Llundain Fwyaf
Llywodraethu
- 17 Ebrill 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Ebrill 2017: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £19.16k | £0 | £9.85k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £10.69k | £9.46k | £7.18k | £5.50k | £1.68k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWHAM AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR MEMBERS OF THE BANGLADESHI COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN HARDSHIP BY: A) RELIEVING POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE SAID INHABITANTS IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE THAT MAY INCLUDE WELFARE BENEFITS, HEALTH AND EDUCATION. B) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE AND OTHER SUBJECT CLASSES.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window