Dogfen lywodraethu THE VINE PROJECT, SURREY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 JULY 2003, 23 MAY 2005, 28 JUNE 2006 AND 9 JULY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A FURNITURE AND GOODS RE-CYCLING SERVICE FOR THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS LIVING IN AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF SURREY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO EDUCATE AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON THESE PRACTICES; (B) TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN PRACTICAL LIFE AND JOB SKILLS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED IN AND AROUND THE SAID COUNTY OF SURREY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
SURREY AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.