THE BROMSGROVE ARTS CENTRE TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
With its 301 seat auditorium, dance studio, meeting rooms and gallery, Artrix provides Bromsgrove with a year round programme of theatre, dance, music, cinema and exhibitions (437 events, screenings and 12 exhibitions in 2008/09) supported by an educational programme of classes, workshops and residencies. It does this through both direct promotion and partnership with other cultural organisations.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 27 Ionawr 2012: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1124900 BROMSGROVE ARTS CENTRE TRUST
- 16 Mai 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 27 Ionawr 2012: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- ARTRIX (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £489.65k | £553.75k | £604.04k | £840.30k | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £497.79k | £553.49k | £621.17k | £862.43k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | N/A | £109 | £1.00k | £1.64k | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | N/A | £95.64k | £123.75k | £140.93k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £459.92k | £477.88k | £697.64k | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | N/A | £3.03k | £1.41k | £101 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | N/A | £109 | £1.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £553.91k | £629.92k | £819.76k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | N/A | £3.51k | £3.54k | £5.27k | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | N/A | £0 | £0 | £37.41k | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 18 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2010 | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2010 | 31 Rhagfyr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 03 Ionawr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 06 Hydref 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 28 Tachwedd 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 24 Gorffennaf 2008 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD APRIL 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND INCREASE APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF ALL FORMS OF THE ARTS AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE ARTS OF DRAMA, DANCE, MUSIC AND PERFORMANCE AND VISUAL ARTS GENERALLY IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION:- 2.1.1 BY PRESENTING, PRODUCING, ORGANISING OR PROMOTING OR PROCURING TO BE PRESENTED, PRODUCED, ORGANISED OR PROMOTED EITHER ALONE OR WITH OTHERS PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCE OR ANY OTHER FORM OF ARTS; AND 2.1.2 BY PROVIDING ORGANISING OR PROMOTING CLASSES AND COURSES IN DRAMA, MUSIC, PAINTING OR ANY OTHER FORM OF THE ARTS. 2.2 TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window