Dogfen lywodraethu MARTLESHAM BRASS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED 13 FEBRUARY 2004, 11 FEBRUARY 2005, 2 FEBRUARY 2007, 06 MARCH 2009 AND 5 MARCH 2010 as amended on 08 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
I) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, IN THE PLAYING OF BRASS INSTRUMENTS AND THEIR APPRECIATION OF BRASS BAND MUSIC II) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF BRASS BAND MUSIC AND TO STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE ART OF BRASS BAND PLAYING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY; 1 )IN THE MARTLESHAM AND KESGRAVE AREAS, AND 2) IN LOCALITIES AND TO AUDIENCES WHERE ACCESS TO BRASS BAND MUSIC WOULD NORMALLY BE PRECLUDED
Maes buddion
SUFFOLK COASTAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.