GOBLIN COMBE ENVIRONMENT CENTRE LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Goblin Combe Environment Centre is committed to promotion of lifelong learning & enhanced personal self-esteem using the natural environment as a stimulus for education & improved self & social awareness. Our variety of residential & non-residential outdoor recreational & educational activities are open to all, but emphasis is put on meeting the needs of excluded & disadvantaged groups of any age.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Hamdden
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- De Swydd Gaerloyw
- Dinas Bryste
- Gogledd Gwlad Yr Haf
- Gwlad Yr Haf
Llywodraethu
- 03 Gorffennaf 2015: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 293705 THE GROUNDWORK SOUTH TRUST LIMITED
- 19 Medi 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Gorffennaf 2015: Tynnwyd (TROSGLWYDDO CRONFEYDD)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £344.53k | £177.90k | £156.44k | £132.60k | £138.22k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £386.21k | £188.42k | £247.40k | £194.24k | £130.22k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2013 | 24 Chwefror 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2013 | 24 Chwefror 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2012 | 14 Mai 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2012 | 17 Ebrill 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2011 | 17 Mai 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2011 | 17 Mai 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 MAY 2003, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 DECEMBER 2003, AND 01/12/2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE CONNECTED WITH EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF LIFELONG LEARNING, ENHANCEMENT, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE AND IN PARTICULAR TO: (A) PROMOTE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND DISADVANTAGED GROUPS TO GAIN ACCESS TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES; (B) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE AND FACILITATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESIDENTIAL STUDY AND EXPERIENCE IN THE COUNTRYSIDE; (C) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR LIFELONG LEARNING WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; (D) PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE DEMONSTRATION OF RESOURCE EFFICIENT TECHNOLOGY; (E) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS, AND PROVIDE BETTER APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND BETTER WAYS OF SERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY; (F) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE USE AND ENJOYMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; (G) PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF OTHER GROUPS AND COLLABORATIVE WORKING BETWEEN ORGANISATIONS OBJECTS COMPLIMENTARY TO THOSE OF THE COMPANY; (H) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE IMPORTANCE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO ALL OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE COMPANY. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE THE PHRASE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" SHALL MEAN DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND IN APPLYING THIS DEFINITION REGARD SHALL BE HAD TO THE FOLLOWING FACTORS NAMELY, TO SOCIAL PROGRESS WHICH RECOGNISES THE NEEDS OF EVERYONE; EFFECTIVE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND MAINTENANCE OF HIGH AND STABLE LEVELS OF ECONOMIC GROWTH AND EMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window