Dogfen lywodraethu SPECIAL NEEDS OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB IN BEDFORDSHIRE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2006 AS AMENDED ON 21/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JUL 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF DISABILITY BETWEEN THE AGES OF 8-25 BY THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND PROGRAMMES TO ENHANCE PHYSICAL EDUCATIONAL, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF:- A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING. B) PROVIDING FACILITIES, RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS, HOLIDAY CLUBS AND WEEKEND CLUBS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE AND INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY. C) PROVIDING SHORT BREAK OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARENTS AND CARERS IN NEED OF SUPPORT BY REASON OF ALL SPECIAL NEEDS, INCLUDING LEARNING, BEHAVIOURAL AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.