COUSINE ISLAND TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Seeking funds to support conservation work on endemic birds and the hawksbill turtle on Cousine Island in the Seychelles, Indian Ocean
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Seychelles
Llywodraethu
- 01 Gorffennaf 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Ebrill 2020: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | 31 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 18 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | 25 Gorffennaf 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 MAY 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
"1. TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF OCEANIC ISLANDS INCLUDING THEIR ECOSYSTEMS AND ASSOCIATED MARINE ENVIRONMENTS AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF COUSINE ISLAND IN THE SEYCHELLES BY INCLUDING (A) ESTABLISHING OR ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SYSTEMS OF SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT OF OCEANIC ISLANDS IN GENERAL AND OF COUSINE ISLAND IN PARTICULAR BASED ON INTEGRATED COASTAL MANAGEMENT CONSERVATION PROGRAMMES AND OTHER NON-INTRUSIVE NON-DAMAGING ACTIVITIES; AND (B) THE DEVELOPMENT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PARTICIPATION OF LOCAL ISLAND COMMUNITIES IN THE CONSERVATION AND RESTORATION OF THEIR ISLAND ECOSYSTEMS AND ASSOCIATED MARINE ENVIRONMENTS, THE PROTECTION OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE ECOLOGICAL DEVELOPMENT; 2 . TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES: AND (B) PROVIDING GRANTS, SCHOLARSHIPS OR ALLOWANCES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE"
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window