Dogfen lywodraethu BROCKWORTH LINK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAY 2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 OCT 2017 as amended on 21 Sep 2020 as amended on 19 Aug 2021 as amended on 15 Apr 2022 as amended on 27 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS INCLUDING THE ELDERLY AND THE DISABLED BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF: (I) ADVICE AND INFORMATION REGARDING THEIR LEGAL ENTITLEMENTS PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) STATE BENEFITS, HOUSING CONSUMER MATTERS AND DEBT AND (II) FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SUBSTANCE ADDICTION TOGETHER WITH THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AS ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
THE BENEFIT AREA SHALL PRIMARILY BE THE CIVIL PARISH OF BROCKWORTH, THE WIDER COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.