THE RUGBY PORTOBELLO TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The Rugby Portobello Trust provides supported housing for vulnerable young people, runs a small school for students aged fourteen to sixteen who are excluded or self excluding from mainstream education and also provides youth work programmes including those based around sports and arts activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Llety/tai
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Kensington And Chelsea
Llywodraethu
- 14 Gorffennaf 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 703163 PEOPLE POTENTIAL POSSIBILITIES
- 17 Hydref 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 14 Gorffennaf 2020: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 17 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 11 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 25 Medi 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JULY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE PRIMARILY IN NORTH KENSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN PROFESSIONS, VOCATIONS, INDUSTRIES, CRAFTS AND TRADES AND BY THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; 2- TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE PRIMARILY RESIDENT IN NORTH KENSINGTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA WITH A PREFERENCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, COUNSELLING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND FINANCIAL AND OTHER ASSISTANCE
Maes buddion
NORTH KENSINGTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window