Dogfen lywodraethu GREAT GLEN U3A INTERESTS GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2015 as amended on 08 May 2018 as amended on 14 May 2019 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN GREAT GLEN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. (II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Maes buddion
GREAT GLEN AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.