LIGHT AND LIFE MINISTRIES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Raised funds that were sent to missions work in Mozambique, Ethiopia, Kenya and America. The funds were used for education and training in Christian life principles as well as leadership development.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- Cenia
- Ethiopia
- India
- Ireland
- Libanus
- Mosambic
- Philipinas
- Unol Daleithiau
Llywodraethu
- 03 Tachwedd 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Medi 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- LIGHT AND LIFE MINISTRIES POYNTON (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £3.49k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.39k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 19 Gorffennaf 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | 16 Medi 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 01 Rhagfyr 2014 | 31 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 MAY 2003, AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2003 AND 6 APRIL 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE MINISTRY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF ASSEMBLIES OD GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (THE STATEMENT) (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OF THE MINISTRY OR ANY OF THEM (3 ) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE MINISTRY CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT (4) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN, IRELAND AND OVERSEAS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE STATEMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES THAT MANIFEST THE STATEMENT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window