GRACE CHURCH EXETER TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity carries out a wide range of activities in accordance with its charitable aims. The trustees consider that these activities, summarised in the report, provide benefit both to those who worship at our Church, the wider community of Devon and indeed the UK and world, and those in condition of need or hardship.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 October 2019
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dyfnaint
Llywodraethu
- 15 Mai 2020: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1182435 GRACE CHURCH EXETER
- 10 Hydref 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 15 Mai 2020: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- FRONTIERS CHURCH EXETER TRUST (Enw blaenorol)
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £214.91k | £215.51k | £232.18k | £242.32k | £280.74k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £201.33k | £198.82k | £213.40k | £174.04k | £267.46k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Hydref 2019 | 18 Ebrill 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Hydref 2019 | 18 Ebrill 2020 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2018 | 20 Mawrth 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2018 | 20 Mawrth 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2017 | 08 Mai 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2017 | 08 Mai 2018 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2016 | 14 Mehefin 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2016 | 14 Mehefin 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/06/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window