Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF THE ROWAN SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19/04/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE USE BY THE CHILDREN, STAFF AND PARENTS/CARERS AT THE ROWAN SCHOOL, DURVALE COURT, SHEFFIELD S17 3PT, HEREIN AFTER CALLED THE SCHOOL. 2. TO PROVIDE EXTRA-CURRICULUM ACTIVITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE CHILDREN, STAFF AND PARENTS/CARERS AT THE SCHOOL. 3. TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES THAT,WILL NOT ONLY BENEFIT THE SCHOOL, BUT ALSO BENEFIT THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN DORE AND TOTLEY.
Maes buddion
SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.