RELATE BROMLEY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Relate provides the following services: adult relationship counselling for couples and individuals; psychosexual therapy; family counselling; counselling for children and young people aged 5 to 18 years. Relate Bromley trades as Relate London South East. We cover eight London boroughs and our main centres are in Bromley, Croydon, Wimbledon and London Bridge.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 May 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Merton
- Southwark
- Sutton
Llywodraethu
- 13 Mai 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
- 14 Tachwedd 2003: Cofrestrwyd
- 13 Mai 2021: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £429.66k | £511.49k | £625.99k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £443.43k | £447.79k | £636.38k | £101.69k | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £4.70k | £0 | £2.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £13.00k | £13.00k | £151.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o roddion a chymynroddion | N/A | £1.31k | £200 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o weithgareddau masnachu eraill | N/A | £74.26k | £62.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Weithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £408.79k | £563.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Gwaddolion | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Buddsoddiad | N/A | £230 | £126 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Arall | N/A | £26.91k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm - Cymynroddion | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ggweithgareddau elusennol | N/A | £447.79k | £587.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Ar godi arian | N/A | £0 | £49.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Llywodraethu | N/A | £3.32k | £4.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Sefydliad grantiau | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Rheoli buddsoddiadau | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Gwariant - Arall | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2020 | 19 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2019 | 18 Tachwedd 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mai 2018 | 01 Chwefror 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mai 2018 | 01 Chwefror 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 15 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 15 Tachwedd 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE; 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH; 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR - 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
BROMLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window