Dogfen lywodraethu ST HELENS DISTRICT SPORTS COUNCIL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2007 AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2008 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES IN THE AREA COVERED BY ST HELENS MBC TO ACHIEVE GREATER COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN SPORT AND HEALTHY RECREATION BY:- A) EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO THE BENEFITS OF THE AVAILABILITY OF HEALTHY RECREATION OPPORTUNITIES, PARTICULARLY TO SCHOOL LEAVERS AND THE YOUNG; B) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SPORTING EVENTS, COMPETITIONS AND ACTIVITIES; C) SUPPORTING CLUB COACH, VOLUNTEER AND ADMINISTRATOR DEVELOPMENT; D) LIASING WITH AND ACTING AS A FORUM FOR THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION BETWEEN ORGANISATIONS TO IDENTIFY GAPS IN SPORT PROVISION; E) EXAMINING AND REPORTING ON THE NEEDS FOR IMPROVED FACILITIES GENERALLY AND REPRESENTING THE RANGE OF VIEWS OF PROVIDERS AND BENEFICIARIES TO POLICY MAKERS AND FUNDERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE ST HELENS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.