Dogfen lywodraethu POSTAL HERITAGE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE:- 3.1.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE HISTORY OF POSTAL COMMUNICATION AND RELATED SERVICES AND OF THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BRITISH POST OFFICE AND ITS SUCCESSORS AND THE POSTAL AND COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS WORLDWIDE; 3.1.2 TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN MUSEUM(S) AND/OR ARCHIVE(S) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PURSUIT OF THAT OBJECT; (A) COLLECT ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES INCLUDING POSTAL ARTEFACTS AND ARCHIVES WHICH MAY BE BRITISH OR INTERNATIONAL TO A PUBLISHED POLICY AGREED BY THE CHARITY; (B) MANAGE, DOCUMENT, CONSERVE AND SAFEGUARD THE NATIONAL POSTAL COLLECTIONS AND OTHER COLLECTIONS AND HOLDINGS TO THE HIGHEST APPROPRIATE PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS; (C) EXHIBIT, INTERPRET AND PROVIDE ACCESS TO THE COLLECTIONS. 3.1.3 RESTORE, EXHIBIT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS, (INCLUDING VEHICLES AND WHERE APPROPRIATE BUILDINGS AND OTHER STRUCTURES) PARTICULARLY THOSE OBJECTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE HISTORY OF POSTAL AND RELATED SERVICES AND THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BRITISH POST OFFICE AND ITS SUCCESSORS; 3.1.4 TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.