HERTFORDSHIRE EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The objects of the charity are to provide, maintain and advance the education of the public and in particular but not so as to limit the generality of the foregoing: 1. to support schools in the county of Hertfordshire in achieving specialist schools status 2. to support the development of specialist schools 3. to support maintaine dschools at levels iin the county of Hertfordshire
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2012
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Swydd Hertford
Llywodraethu
- 17 Mawrth 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Rhagfyr 2012: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £463 | £188 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.33k | £10.45k | £15.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 05 Rhagfyr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 03 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 14 Chwefror 2011 | 14 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 26 Mai 2010 | 115 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JANUARY 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: I. TO SUPPORT SCHOOLS IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD IN ACHIEVING THE STATUS OF SPECIALIST SCHOOLS AND OPERATING AS SUCH II. TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF SPECIALIST SCHOOLS BY PROVIDING WIDESPREAD INTEREST IN AND TO INFORM THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE SPECIALIST SCHOOLS PROGRAMME III. TO SUPPORT MAINTAINED SCHOOLS AT ALL LEVELS IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORD GENERALLY IN PROJECTS AND SERVICES NOT MET BY STATUTORY FUNDING.
Maes buddion
HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window