Dogfen lywodraethu ST PHILIP'S CE (A) PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2004. NCPTA MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 2010 as amended on 29 Oct 2018 as amended on 30 Oct 2019 as amended on 18 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL AND PRE-SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Maes buddion
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF ST PHILIPS CE (A) PRIMARY SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.