Dogfen lywodraethu AWEL AMAN TAWE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2006 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/01/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN ENERGY EFFICIENCY AND RENEWABLE RESOURCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 2 THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY AND ENERGY SAVING MEASURES; 3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; 4 TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT RELATING TO THE UTILISATION OF ENERGY CONSERVATION PRACTICES AND RENEWABLE ENERGY TECHNOLOGIES AND TO USE THE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 5 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISIONS OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO ADVANCING EDUCATION AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED; 6 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND SUPPORT FOR THE UNEMPLOYED; 7 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN SOUTH WALES AND FURTHER AFIELD; 8 THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; AND 9 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.