Dogfen lywodraethu RIPPLE AFRICA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2012 as amended on 23 Jan 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN MALAWI AND GREATER AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLS, VOLUNTEER TEACHING ASSISTANTS, EQUIPMENT; 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN MALAWI AND GREATER AFRICA; 3. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE ENVIRONMENT IN MALAWI AND GREATER AFRICA, AND TO PROMOTE BETTER METHODS OF AGRICULTURE AND MANAGEMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES; 4. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY HELPING PEOPLE IN MALAWI AND GREATER AFRICA TO START THEIR OWN SUSTAINABLE BUSINESSES.
Maes buddion
MALAWI AND GREATER AFRICA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.