ACCENTURE DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIPS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The overall goal of Accenture Development Partnerships is to channel Accenture's capabilities and assets to help address international development challanges, working in collaboration with non-profit and non-governmental organisations, foundations and donor agencies.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Rydychen
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Bangladesh
- Cambodia
- Cenia
- Costa Rica
- De Affrica
- Ethiopia
- Fiet-nam
- Ghana
- India
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Mosambic
- Namibia
- Niger
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Philipinas
- Rwanda
- Sierra Leone
- Sri Lanka
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Unol Daleithiau
- Yr Aifft
- Zambia
Llywodraethu
- 04 Ionawr 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Ebrill 2021: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Buddsoddi
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2020 | 08 Ebrill 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2019 | 22 Hydref 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2019 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2018 | 22 Hydref 2019 | 114 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2017 | 19 Mawrth 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2017 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 22ND DECEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR WORKING IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR IN THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS TO VOLUNTARY SECTOR ORGANISATIONS. (DEFINITIONS OF "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" "CHARITIES" AND "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS") 3.2 RELIEVE POVERTY IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AREAS OF THE WORLD BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SMALL AND MEDIUM ENTERPRISES WHERE THE INCREASE IN CAPACITY FROM THE PROVISION OF SUCH SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION WILL RELIEVE POVERTY IN THOSE AREAS. 3.3 RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN BUSINESS AND TECHNOLOGY SKILLS TO GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS AND OTHER STATUTORY BODIES WHERE THE LACK OF CAPACITY IN THOSE DEPARTMENTS OR BODIES INHIBITS THEIR DELIVERY OF ASSISTANCE WHICH IS DESIGNED TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND/OR PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH IN POOR COUNTRIES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AREAS OF THE WORLD.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window