Dogfen lywodraethu TIBETAN SAKYA TRUST

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/03/2013 as amended on 23 Feb 2023 as amended on 06 Jun 2023 as amended on 14 Aug 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 The Objects are, for the public benefit, 3.1.1 to advance the Buddhist religion, particularly but not exclusively the Sakya tradition of Tibetan Buddhism; 3.1.2 to advance the education of the public in the principles and philosophies of Tibetan Buddhism through teaching, study and observance of the traditions of Tibetan Buddhism; 3.1.3 to relieve poverty and sickness and to advance education by any charitable means as the trustees from time to time determine.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.