Dogfen lywodraethu REMARKABLE AUTISM LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JUNE 2004 AND AT AN AGM ON 10 MAY 2010 A SPECIAL RESOLUTION WAS ADOPTED AND REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JULY 2010 as amended on 14 Nov 2022 as amended on 04 Nov 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS WHICH WILL BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE:- 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER BY CARRYING ON AND MANAGING A SCHOOL AND FURTHER EDUCATION COLLEGE, AND PROVISION OF OUTREACH SERVICES. 2. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF PERSONS WITH AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORT FOR LIVING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.