Dogfen lywodraethu ASPIRING COMMUNITIES TOGETHER LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/10/2015 as amended on 30 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; B) TO ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE YEMENI CULTURE; C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID YEMENI COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
DIRECTED WHOLLY OR MAINLY TO THE BENEFIT OF THE YEMENI COMMUNITY IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.