SEBASTIAN'S ACTION TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Providing respite breaks and day visits at The Bluebells, a purpose built faclity in Hampshire for seriously-ill children and their families.These children have life limiting or life threatening conditions and come from all over the UK. We provide practical support in Berks,Hants,Surrey & Bucks including emergency transport, wellbeing therapy, sibling support, help at home and bereavement care.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2013
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Anabledd
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Slough
- Surrey
- Swydd Buckingham
- Swydd Rydychen
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Llywodraethu
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £280.17k | £432.85k | £421.16k | £497.22k | £318.04k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £187.61k | £215.30k | £348.24k | £475.56k | £333.76k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2014 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 18 Medi 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2013 | 18 Medi 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | 13 Awst 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2012 | 13 Awst 2013 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | 01 Hydref 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2011 | 01 Hydref 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MARCH 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9 AUGUST 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND OTHER LIFE THREATENING ILLNESS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE TREATED AT THE JOHN RADCLIFFE HOSPITAL OXFORD AND HELEN HOUSE HOSPICE FOR CHILDREN OXFORD, AND TO SUPPORT THEIR FAMILIES BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window