MAJOR MUSIC
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Music provides the soundtrack to people's lives. It can be educational, informative and empowering, but it should also be enjoyed. Creative music making and affording young people constructive, meaningful and rewarding opportunities has been a key theme to Major Music and it's aims and objectives since it's inception in February 2000.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru
Llywodraethu
- 27 Medi 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 26 Ionawr 2015: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £15.10k | £32.04k | £20.53k | £11.89k | £23.29k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £13.58k | £28.79k | £17.13k | £10.01k | £14.19k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 16 Rhagfyr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 17 Ionawr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2012 | 03 Rhagfyr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 24 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 24 Ionawr 2012 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2004 AND 21 SEPTEMBER 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE, OTHER INDIVIDUALS, COMMUNITY GROUPS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN AND ACROSS THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREAS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING, THE ART OF MUSIC AND MUSIC MAKING (IN ALL ITS FORMS); AND (B) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SUCH MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS; IMPROVE THEIR EMPLOYABILITY; AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Maes buddion
THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window