Dogfen lywodraethu CROSS KEYS HOMES LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 SEP 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) PROVIDE HOUSES, SOCIAL HOUSING OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 2) PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 4) PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 5) RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREA IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK; 6) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 7) MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.