Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA ARCHERY SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 1107064

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2007 AS AMENDED ON 22/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE PURSUIT OF ARCHERY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY IN THE LEAMINGTON SPA AREA OF WARWICKSHIRE.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.