Dogfen lywodraethu SINFIN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/06/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE BENEFIT FOR THE RESIDENTS OF SINFIN WARD; WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX , SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND RACE; OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS; IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RAISE ASPIRATION, ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS IN SINFIN WARD. 2) TO PROMOTE THE CARE, ACCOMMODATION, WELFARE, INTERESTS, TRAINING, ADVANCEMENT AND INTEGRATION OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES IN THE CITY OF DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Maes buddion
THE CITY OR DERBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.