Dogfen lywodraethu AGORED CYMRU

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 7 DECEMBER 2005, 10 MARCH 2009, 9 OCTOBER 2009 AND 17 FEBRUARY 2011. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC OF WALES AND BEYOND IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 1. BY PROMOTING LEARNING, WIDENING OPPORTUNITY AND ENABLING PROGRESSION IN EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 2. BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY AND FLEXIBILITY OF EDUCATION PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; 3.3 BY EXTENDING ACCESS TO LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITATING PROGRESSION TO FURTHER LEARNING, EMPLOYMENT AND HIGHER EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE AWARD OF CREDITS AND CREDIT BASED QUALIFICATIONS.
Maes buddion
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.