Dogfen lywodraethu THE KIMMERIDGE TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 1106638

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A JURASSIC MARINE LIFE CENTRE IN DORSET FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
LULWORTH, PURBECK
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.