Dogfen lywodraethu BATH NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 09/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/2013 as amended on 04 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF NATURAL HISTORY AND IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE SOCIETY; 2) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY, CONSERVATION AND RECORDING OF THE FAUNA AND FLORA OF THE BATH AREA; 3) TO LIASE WITH OTHER NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETIES AND CONSERVATION BODIES; 4) TO PUBLISH AN ANNUAL MAGAZINE, WHICH SHALL BE FREE TO MEMBERS, EXCEPT THOSE WHOSE ANNUAL SUBSCRIPTIONS ARE IN ARREARS.
Maes buddion
BATH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.