Dogfen lywodraethu HOME-START CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/05/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/04/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUN 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN. (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN. (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE WITHIN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Maes buddion
CAMBRIDGE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.