TULIP FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote the relieve of poverty abd sickness, advance education and protest, preserve health, particularly with the disadvantage young vulnerable adult both local, national and international. To promote other charitable purpose as may arise from time to time as determined. To promote the benfit of the people and the neighbourhood togather confined by resident without distinction.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 04 April 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Llety/tai
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Caint
- Essex
- Surrey
- Llundain Fwyaf
- Ciwba
- Haiti
- Nigeria
- Unol Daleithiau
- Y Weriniaeth Ddominicaidd
Llywodraethu
- 08 Medi 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Rhagfyr 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- CMIS HOUSING AND SUPPORT SERVICES (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 04/04/2011 | 04/04/2012 | 04/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | 04/04/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 04 Ebrill 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 04 Ebrill 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 04 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 04 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 04 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 04 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 04 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 04 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THURROCK, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER CONFINED BY RESIDENCE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE SUPPORT SERVICES THAT WILL IMPROVE ACCESS TO HOUSING AND BY COMMUNITY INTERVENTION DESIGNED TO REDUCE EXCLUSION FROM HOUSING AND ALL OTHER RELATION ISSUES, TO ASCERTAIN RESOURCES ARE USED CONSTRUCTIVELY, FAIRLY AND EFFECTIVELY TO REDUCE CRIME AND REPAIRS THE FABRIC OF SOCIETY, TO ENHANCED EDUCATION, TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS MOST LIKELY TO REDUCE CRIME AND ANY FURTHER OFFENDING REPAIR RELATIONSHIPS AND ENCOURAGE RE-INTEGRATION. 2. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEVE OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROTECT, PRESERVE HEALTH, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, OF THE DISADVANTAGE YOUNG VULNERABLE ADULT THAT INCLUDES THE HOMELESS, REFUGEES, ISOLATION OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE OR AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER AND PROBLEMS. 3. PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
THURROCK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window