Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHERN BAPTIST COLLEGE LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 OCTOBER 1956 AS AMENDED ON 8 DECEMBER 1965, BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2004, AND CERTIFICATE ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 4 FEBRUARY 2005. as amended on 11 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING THEOLOGICAL EDUCATION, PRIMARILY FOR CHRISTIAN PEOPLE, WITH A VIEW TO MINISTRY AND MISSION IN AND THROUGH BAPTIST CHURCHES IN GREAT BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE, AND THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF RELIGION MAINTAINED BY BAPTIST CHURCHES AS SET FORTH IN THE "DECLARATION OF PRINCIPLE" ADOPTED FROM TIME TO TIME IN THE CONSTITUTION OF THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN, SHALL BE TAUGHT ("THE PRIMARY OBJECT).
Maes buddion
GREAT BRITAIN AND WORLDWIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.