Dogfen lywodraethu THE EAST PRESTON SILVER SURFERS COMPUTER CLUB
Rhif yr elusen: 1106827

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/2012 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS OVER 55 YEARS OF AGE BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND FACILITIES FOR THE ACQUISITION OF BASIC SKILLS IN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.