Dogfen lywodraethu GIVING WORLD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/04/2011 as amended on 26 Jul 2022 as amended on 18 Feb 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AID, GRANTS, GOODS, EQUIPMENT AND BY OTHER SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE..
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.