MALAWI ASSOCIATION MIDLANDS
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity has various areas of activities which it offers to the community; 1,Advisory to the community on education,health and social welfare just to mention a few. 2,Some of our members are barristers/solicitors we use their expertise on immigration and any legal law to advise and assist the community with their problems. 3, The charity provides recreations to the youth in form all sports.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Dinas Birmingham
- Dinas Coventry
- Dinas Leeds
- Swydd Derby
- Swydd Gaerl?r
- Swydd Northampton
- Swydd Nottingham
Llywodraethu
- 12 Tachwedd 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Rhagfyr 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6.86k | £2.87k | £15.14k | £2.34k | £2.34k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.79k | £2.21k | £9.94k | £2.23k | £2.23k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION DATED 6 MARCH 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE MALAWIAN OR OF MALAWIAN DESCENT OR THOSE INTERESTED IN A CONNECTION WITH MALAWI IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL REGION OF THE MIDLANDS IN ENGLAND THROUGH: (I) RELIEVING THOSE AFFLICTED BY ABJECT POVERTY OR SICKNESS OR DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE DEATH OF FAMILY MEMBER, ANY RELATIVE OR FRIEND IN ENGLAND OR ELSEWHERE, (II) ADVANCING CULTURAL TRADITIONS OF AND CONNECTED WITH MALAWI, THROUGH THE EDUCATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE ASPECTS OF THE CULTURAL TRADITIONS OF MALAWI TO THE YOUTH OF MALAWI DESCENT OR ANY INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC (III) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED. (IV) IN OBSERVANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS ACT 1998, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE WHERE AND WHEN NEED ARISES ON ISSUES OF HOUSING, HEALTH, IMMIGRATION, SOCIAL WELFARE, EMPLOYMENT AND ANY MATTERS CONNECTED WITH AND INCIDENTAL TO THE FOREGOING.
Maes buddion
MIDLANDS, ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window