Dogfen lywodraethu COTSWOLD FRIENDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT THE COTSWOLDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; AND B) TO PROVIDE A CENTRE FOR THE RECRUITMENT, GUIDANCE AND DEPLOYMENT OF VOLUNTEERS TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE PURPOSES.
Maes buddion
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.