INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF CHURCHES-UK (ALSO KNOWN AS COC) LTD
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity has continued to provide support, encouragement and guidance to network of churches throughout Europe. a various number of Regional, National and European conferences have been organised in the year also a Bible course has been developed. All key to the objectives of the charity.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- De Affrica
- Denmarc
- Ffrainc
- Gwlad Yr Iâ
- India
- Malta
- Nepal
- Pakistan
- Philipinas
- Serbia
- Slofenia
- Ukrain
- Yr Aifft
- Yr Alban
Llywodraethu
- 06 Rhagfyr 2004: Cofrestrwyd
- 18 Ebrill 2023: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- INTERNATIONAL NETWORK OF CHURCHES (OR INC) (Enw gwaith)
- CHRISTIAN OUTREACH CENTRE-EUROPE (Enw blaenorol)
- Talu staff
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £126.37k | £90.90k | £72.62k | £13.56k | £4.08k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £155.29k | £102.02k | £40.44k | £18.99k | £44.49k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2022 | 17 Hydref 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 06 Rhagfyr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 08 Chwefror 2021 | 8 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 07 Ionawr 2021 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 20 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2019 | 20 Ionawr 2020 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/11/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGH WORSHIP, PREACHING AND TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, FELLOWSHIP, AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF BIBLE TEACHING IN ALL FORMS OF MEDIA, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY. 2. THE INSTRUCTION AND CARE OF CHRISTIANS INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN. 3. THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 5. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR DISTRESS OR AGES OR SICK.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window