Dogfen lywodraethu ACCESSIBLE FRIENDS NETWORK (TAFN)

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY, WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL AND THEREFORE IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.