Dogfen lywodraethu CITIZENS UK CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/04/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/12/2015 as amended on 21 Dec 2017 as amended on 23 Feb 2021 as amended on 02 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects for which the Charity is established are: · to develop the capacity and skills of the members of socially and economically disadvantaged communities in such a way that such members are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society, · to assist by directly promoting the more effective working of charitable community capacity building organisations designed to pursue that aim, · to advance the voluntary sector, · to advance physical and mental health, · to relieve poverty, unemployment, or those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage, · to advance environmental protection or improvement and sustainable development, · to advance the arts, culture, heritage or science, and · to further such exclusively charitable objects as the Trustees in their absolute discretion from time to time determine. Sustainable development means "development which meets the needs of the present without compromising the ability of future generations to meet their own needs." Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005. The amendment has been made to the final objective to remove reference to the “laws of England and Wales” and insert the following wording “Nothing in these Articles shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005”.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.