Dogfen lywodraethu Brighton & Hove Albion Foundation
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 05 May 2020 as amended on 06 Dec 2022 as amended on 26 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are for the benefit of the inhabitants of the City of Brighton and Hove, Sussex and elsewhere: 2.1 the advancement of education; 2.2 the preservation and protection of good health; 2.3 to provide or assist in the provision of facilities in the interests of social welfare for the recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disability, financial hardship or social circumstances with the object of improving their conditions of life; and 2.4 to promote such other purposes as are charitable under the law of England and Wales from time to time in particular but without limitation through an association with football.
Maes buddion
CITY OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE, EAST SUSSEX AND WEST SUSSEX.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.